LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Michigan MI
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB0568
Draft Versions
MI
Michigan Senate Bill SB0568
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session
Michigan Senate Bill SB0568
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
October 5, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
September 25, 2024
Compare
Bill
March 12, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
October 8, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
October 15, 2024
Chaptered
Bill
October 10, 2024
Compare