Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0572 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 1, 2023
Bill October 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill November 21, 2023

Chaptered

Bill November 28, 2023