Senate | 12/29/2023 | Assigned Pa 0227'23 With Immediate Effect | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 11/22/2023 01:56 Pm | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Approved By Governor 11/22/2023 11:50 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Presented To Governor 11/21/2023 10:24 Am | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Given Immediate Effect | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 455 Yeas 102 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/24/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Referred To Committee On Elections | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Received On 10/18/2023 | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 540 Yeas 30 Nays 8 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 10/10/2023 | Introduced By Senator Jeremy Moss |