House | 12/10/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Referred To Committee On Economic Development And Small Business | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Received On 03/20/2024 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 80 Yeas 20 Nays 15 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Substitute (s-2) Adopted | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 10/26/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 10/26/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Referred To Committee On Economic And Community Development | ||
Senate | 10/11/2023 | Introduced By Senator Sam Singh |