Senate | 12/29/2023 | Assigned Pa 0256'23 | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/01/2023 11:12 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Approved By Governor 11/30/2023 12:26 Pm | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Presented To Governor 11/21/2023 10:54 Am | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 543 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 11/08/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Referred To Committee On Elections | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Received On 11/02/2023 | ||
Senate | 11/02/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 647 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 10/31/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Introduced By Senator Mary Cavanagh |