Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Assigned Pa 0228'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/22/2023 01:58 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Approved By Governor 11/22/2023 11:52 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2023
|
Presented To Governor 11/17/2023 09:55 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 521 Yeas 104 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Received On 10/25/2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/25/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 592 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2023
|
Introduced By Senator Rosemary Bayer
|
|
|