House | 10/31/2023 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/31/2023 | Received On 10/26/2023 | ||
Senate | 10/26/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 595 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 10/26/2023 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/18/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services | ||
Senate | 10/17/2023 | Introduced By Senator Erika Geiss |