House | 03/20/2024 | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Received On 03/20/2024 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 88 Yeas 20 Nays 15 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 11/14/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
Senate | 10/19/2023 | Introduced By Senator Sylvia Santana |