Senate | 12/29/2023 | Assigned Pa 0284'23 | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Filed With Secretary Of State 12/08/2023 10:30 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Approved By Governor 12/07/2023 10:22 Am | ||
Senate | 12/29/2023 | Presented To Governor 12/06/2023 09:44 Am | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 11/09/2023 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 555 Yeas 62 Nays 46 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 11/09/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 11/01/2023 | Received On 11/01/2023 | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Passed Roll Call # 636 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Referred To Committee On Oversight | ||
Senate | 10/24/2023 | Introduced By Senator Edward Mcbroom |