Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0076'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/08/2024 01:20 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By Governor 07/08/2024 09:44 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Presented To Governor 06/26/2024 02:52 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 250 Yeas 31 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
House Substitute (h-3) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 154 Yeas 65 Nays 44 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Substitute (h-3) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Postponed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Received On 04/16/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 93 Yeas 31 Nays 5 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Substitute (s-3) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
Introduced By Senator John Damoose
|
|
|