House | 11/13/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 11/13/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Referred To Committee On Local Government And Municipal Finance | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/20/2024 | Received On 06/20/2024 | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 252 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 06/18/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Referred To Committee On Local Government | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Introduced By Senator Paul Wojno |