Senate | 10/09/2024 | Assigned Pa 0134'24 | ||
Senate | 10/09/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/08/2024 01:12 Pm | ||
Senate | 10/09/2024 | Approved By Governor 10/08/2024 10:44 Am | ||
Senate | 10/08/2024 | Presented To Governor 10/07/2024 11:28 Am | ||
Senate | 09/26/2024 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Postponed For The Day | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 139 Yeas 56 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 7 | ||
House | 05/22/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 05/21/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/14/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Received On 03/19/2024 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 66 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 03/19/2024 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred To Committee On Education | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Introduced By Senator Kristen Mcdonald Rivet |