Senate
|
06/11/2024
|
Referred To Conference Committee
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2024
|
House Conferees Named 06/05/2024: Reps. Will Snyder Jasper Martus Greg Vanwoerkom
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2024
|
Senate Conferees Named 06/05/2024: Sens. Sarah Anthony Sean Mccann Jon Bumstead
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2024
|
Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
Senate Named Conferees 06/04/2024: Sens. Sarah Anthony, Sean Mccann, Jon C. Bumstead
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 213 Yeas 1 Nays 37 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
House Substitute (h-1) Nonconcurred In
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 94 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Received On 05/09/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 134 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Introduced By Senator Sarah Anthony
|
|
|