House
|
06/06/2024
|
Re-received From Senate With Notice Of Nonconcurrence In House Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Senate Conferees Named 06/04/2024: Sens. Mary Cavanagh Sarah Anthony Jon Bumstead
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
Senate Named Conferees 06/04/2024: Sens. Mary Cavanagh, Sarah Anthony, Jon C. Bumstead
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 225 Yeas 0 Nays 38 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
House Substitute (h-1) Nonconcurred In
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 103 Yeas 56 Nays 51 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2024
|
Notice Given To Discharge Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Received On 05/02/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 113 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Introduced By Senator Mary Cavanagh
|
|
|