Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0144'24
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/08/2024 01:32 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Approved By Governor 10/08/2024 11:06 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Presented To Governor 10/07/2024 10:56 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 351 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 302 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
House Substitute (h-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Received On 06/26/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 328 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel
|
|
|