Senate | 10/09/2024 | Assigned Pa 0145'24 | ||
Senate | 10/09/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 10/08/2024 01:34 Pm | ||
Senate | 10/09/2024 | Approved By Governor 10/08/2024 11:04 Am | ||
Senate | 10/08/2024 | Presented To Governor 10/07/2024 10:58 Am | ||
Senate | 09/25/2024 | Ordered Enrolled | ||
Senate | 09/25/2024 | Roll Call: Roll Call # 352 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 09/25/2024 | House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 303 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 09/25/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Received On 06/26/2024 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 329 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Introduced By Senator Sylvia Santana |