Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0799 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 14, 2024

Engrossed

Bill June 20, 2024
Bill April 10, 2024

Enrolled

Bill July 11, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis December 10, 2024

Chaptered

Bill July 25, 2024