House | 12/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 12/12/2024 | Received On 12/12/2024 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 516 Yeas 23 Nays 13 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 11/13/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/31/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/31/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Introduced By Senator Sue Shink |