House | 12/11/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 11/12/2024 | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice | ||
House | 11/12/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/12/2024 | Received On 11/07/2024 | ||
Senate | 11/07/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 411 Yeas 24 Nays 11 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/07/2024 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 10/30/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) | ||
Senate | 10/30/2024 | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 10/30/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) | ||
Senate | 10/24/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 10/24/2024 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Introduced By Senator John Cherry |