Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0135'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/08/2024 01:14 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/09/2024
|
Approved By Governor 10/08/2024 10:46 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2024
|
Presented To Governor 10/07/2024 11:10 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 363 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2024
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 324 Yeas 99 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Vote On Passage Reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2024
|
House Requests Return
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
09/25/2024
|
Returned As Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 72 Yeas 98 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Notice Given To Discharge Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Received On 05/02/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 109 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Committee Recommended Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Introduced By Senator John Cherry
|
|
|