House | 12/11/2024 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Notice Given To Discharge Committee | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 12/03/2024 | Received On 12/03/2024 | ||
Senate | 12/03/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 423 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 12/03/2024 | Substitute (s-1) Adopted | ||
Senate | 10/30/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/30/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Referred To Committee On Housing And Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Introduced By Senator Sarah Anthony |