Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0079'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/08/2024 01:26 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/30/2024
|
Approved By Governor 07/08/2024 09:50 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2024
|
Presented To Governor 06/26/2024 02:58 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2024
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 176 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2024
|
Received On 06/04/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 208 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Introduced By Senator Veronica Klinefelt
|
|
|