Senate
|
12/19/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0169'24
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/17/2024 01:10 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2024
|
Approved By Governor 12/17/2024 12:42 Pm
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2024
|
Presented To Governor 12/13/2024 11:56 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2024
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 502 Yeas 25 Nays 11 Excused 2 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2024
|
House Substitute (h-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 385 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
12/10/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/26/2024
|
Received On 06/26/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 315 Yeas 28 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Placed On Order Of General Orders
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Introduced By Senator Sam Singh
|
|
|