Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0881 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 10, 2024
Bill June 26, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 13, 2024

Chaptered

Bill December 18, 2024