House | 12/11/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/11/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/15/2024 | Referred To Committee On Agriculture | ||
House | 10/15/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/15/2024 | Received On 10/15/2024 | ||
Senate | 10/08/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 371 Yeas 36 Nays 0 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 10/08/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 10/08/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 10/08/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/08/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/02/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/02/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Reassigned To Committee On Natural Resources And Agriculture | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Introduced By Senator Sam Singh |