House | 09/18/2024 | Laid Over One Day Under The Rules | ||
House | 09/18/2024 | Re-returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) To House Substitute (h-3) With Full Title | ||
Senate | 09/17/2024 | Roll Call: Roll Call # 341 Yeas 20 Nays 16 Excused 2 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 09/17/2024 | House Substitute (h-3) Concurred In As Substituted (s-2) | ||
Senate | 09/17/2024 | Substitute (s-2) Adopted | ||
Senate | 09/17/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Returned To Senate | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 270 Yeas 56 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Substitute (h-3) Adopted | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/27/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Second Reading | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Motion To Discharge Committee Approved | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Received On 06/20/2024 | ||
House | 06/25/2024 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 270 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 06/20/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 06/12/2024 | Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel |