House | 12/10/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 12/10/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 10/17/2024 | Referred To Committee On Families, Children And Seniors | ||
House | 10/17/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 10/16/2024 | Received On 10/16/2024 | ||
Senate | 10/16/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 375 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 10/16/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 10/16/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 10/16/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 10/16/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 10/08/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/08/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
Senate | 06/13/2024 | Introduced By Senator Kevin Hertel |