Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0934 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill June 13, 2024

Engrossed

Bill September 25, 2024
Bill June 20, 2024

Enrolled

Bill October 7, 2024

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2024