House | 11/14/2024 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 11/14/2024 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 11/07/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 11/07/2024 | Received On 11/07/2024 | ||
Senate | 11/07/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 410 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/07/2024 | Substitute (s-2) Defeated | ||
House | 11/07/2024 | Referred To Committee On Labor | ||
Senate | 10/30/2024 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 10/30/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 10/30/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 10/30/2024 | Substitute (s-1) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 10/30/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 10/17/2024 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Introduced By Senator Darrin Camilleri |