Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB0982 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 15, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 4, 2024
Bill October 30, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 13, 2024

Chaptered

Bill December 26, 2024