Senate
|
12/30/2024
|
Assigned Pa 0175'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/30/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/23/2024 11:12 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/30/2024
|
Approved By Governor 12/23/2024 10:04 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2024
|
Presented To Governor 12/13/2024 11:46 Am
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2024
|
Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2024
|
Given Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Returned To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 371 Yeas 104 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2024
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Per Rule 41 Referred To Committee On Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/07/2024
|
Received On 11/07/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 400 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2024
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/30/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/24/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Introduced By Senator Dan Lauwers
|
|
|