House | 12/13/2024 | Referred To Committee On Government Operations | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 12/13/2024 | Received On 12/13/2024 | ||
Senate | 12/12/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 566 Yeas 35 Nays 0 Excused 3 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 11/07/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3) | ||
Senate | 11/07/2024 | Substitute (s-3) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 11/07/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3) | ||
Senate | 10/24/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 10/24/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 10/23/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 10/23/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 10/23/2024 | Reassigned To Committee On Education | ||
Senate | 09/11/2024 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
Senate | 09/11/2024 | Introduced By Senator Stephanie Chang |