Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan Senate Bill SB1050 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 23, 2024

Engrossed

Bill December 5, 2024
Bill October 30, 2024

Enrolled

Bill December 13, 2024

Chaptered

Bill December 26, 2024