1 | 1 | | senate concurrent resolution no.18 Senator Singh offered the following concurrent resolution: A concurrent resolution to prescribe the legislative schedule. Resolved by the Senate (the House of Representatives concurring), That when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, June 27, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, July 30, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; when it adjourns on Tuesday, July 30, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, July 31, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; when it adjourns on Wednesday, July 31, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, August 13, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; when it adjourns on Tuesday, August 13, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, August 14, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; when it adjourns on Wednesday, August 14, 2024, it stands adjourned until Thursday, August 15, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; when it adjourned on Thursday, August 15, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, September 4, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; and be it further Resolved, That when the House of Representatives adjourns on Thursday, June 27, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, July 30, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourns on Tuesday, July 30, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, July 31, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourns on Wednesday, July 31, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, August 13, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourns on Tuesday, August 13, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, August 14, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourned on Wednesday, August 14, 2024, it stands adjourned until Thursday, August 15, 2024, at 12:00 noon; when it adjourns on Thursday, August 15, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, September 11, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | senate concurrent resolution no.18 |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | Senator Singh offered the following concurrent resolution: |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A concurrent resolution to prescribe the legislative schedule. |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | Resolved by the Senate (the House of Representatives concurring), That when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, June 27, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, July 30, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; when it adjourns on Tuesday, July 30, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, July 31, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; when it adjourns on Wednesday, July 31, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, August 13, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; when it adjourns on Tuesday, August 13, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, August 14, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; when it adjourns on Wednesday, August 14, 2024, it stands adjourned until Thursday, August 15, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; when it adjourned on Thursday, August 15, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, September 4, 2024, at 10:00 a.m.; and be it further |
---|
14 | 14 | | |
---|
15 | 15 | | Resolved, That when the House of Representatives adjourns on Thursday, June 27, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, July 30, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourns on Tuesday, July 30, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, July 31, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourns on Wednesday, July 31, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, August 13, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourns on Tuesday, August 13, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, August 14, 2024, at 1:30 p.m.; when it adjourned on Wednesday, August 14, 2024, it stands adjourned until Thursday, August 15, 2024, at 12:00 noon; when it adjourns on Thursday, August 15, 2024, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, September 11, 2024, at 1:30 p.m. |
---|