Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0008

Introduced
1/12/23  
A resolution to declare January 2023 as Human Trafficking Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0009

Introduced
1/12/23  
A resolution to declare January 11, 2023, as Human Trafficking Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0010

Introduced
1/12/23  
A resolution to declare January 2023 as Fire Fighter Cancer Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0011

Introduced
1/12/23  
A resolution to declare January 2023 as National Blood Donor Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0012

Introduced
1/18/23  
A resolution to declare January 17, 2023, as Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Incorporated, Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0013

Introduced
1/18/23  
A resolution to declare January 2023 as Local School Board Recognition Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0014

Introduced
1/18/23  
A resolution to commemorate January 2023 as the 94th anniversary of the birth of Dr. Martin Luther King Jr.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0015

Introduced
1/18/23  
A resolution to declare January 15, 2023, as Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated, Founders’ Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0016

Introduced
1/18/23  
A resolution to declare January 2023 as Finnish-American Heritage Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0017

Introduced
1/18/23  
A resolution to declare January 9, 2023, as Phi Beta Sigma Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0018

Introduced
1/18/23  
A resolution to honor the one hundred and third anniversary of Zeta Phi Beta Sorority, Incorporated, and declare January 16, 2023, as Zeta Phi Beta Sorority, Incorporated, Founders’ Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0019

Introduced
1/18/23  
A resolution to amend the Standing Rules of the House of Representatives.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0020

Introduced
1/24/23  
A resolution to declare January 22-28, 2023, as School Choice Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0021

Introduced
1/26/23  
A resolution to declare January 29-February 4, 2023, as Catholic Schools Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0022

Introduced
1/26/23  
A resolution to declare January 27, 2023, as Holocaust Remembrance Day in the state of Michigan.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records