Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House of Representatives 2023 Bills & Legislation

MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0023

Introduced
1/31/23  
A resolution to declare January 31, 2023, as Gas Stove Appreciation Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0024

Introduced
2/1/23  
A resolution to declare February 1, 2023, as Blue Star Mothers Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0025

Introduced
2/1/23  
A resolution to declare February 2023 as Self-Care Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0026

Introduced
2/1/23  
A resolution to oppose any attempt by the President of the United States or the United States Consumer Product Safety Commission to ban the use of gas stoves.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0027

Introduced
2/8/23  
A resolution to declare February 2, 2023, as Optimist Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0028

Introduced
2/8/23  
A resolution to declare February 2023 as Career and Technical Education Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0029

Introduced
2/8/23  
A resolution to declare February 2023 as American Heart Month and February 3, 2023, as National Wear Red Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0030

Introduced
2/8/23  
A resolution to declare February 2023 as Cholangiocarcinoma Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0031

Introduced
2/8/23  
A resolution to declare February 7-14, 2023, as Congenital Heart Defect Awareness Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0032

Introduced
2/8/23  
A resolution to declare February 6-10, 2023, as School Counseling Week in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0033

Introduced
2/9/23  
A resolution to express our commitment, in partnership with the United States Air Force, to accelerating change in order to compete with, deter, and, if necessary, defeat a peer adversary, and to urge the United States Air Force to replace the A-10s with an advanced generation fighter mission at Selfridge Air National Guard Base.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0034

Introduced
2/9/23  
A resolution to declare February 11, 2023, as White Shirt Day in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0035

Introduced
2/9/23  
A resolution to declare February 2023 as Black History Month in the state of Michigan.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0036

Introduced
2/15/23  
A resolution of tribute to express our condolences for the tragic shooting at Michigan State University.
MI

Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0037

Introduced
2/15/23  
A resolution to declare February 14, 2023, as Frederick Douglass Day in the state of Michigan.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records