Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0025

Introduced
2/1/23  

Caption

A resolution to declare February 2023 as Self-Care Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.

Impact

By officially designating a month dedicated to self-care, HR0025 seeks to raise public awareness about the benefits of self-care routines. The resolution states that effective self-care practices can lead to fewer unnecessary visits to healthcare providers, thus alleviating the burden on the healthcare system. It refers to evidence stating that the use of over-the-counter medications can save the healthcare system significantly, further supporting the economic rationale behind promoting self-care.

Summary

House Resolution 0025 aims to declare February 2023 as Self-Care Awareness Month in the state of Michigan. The resolution emphasizes the importance of self-care practices, which include maintaining good hygiene, eating healthy, exercising regularly, and managing personal healthcare. It acknowledges that practicing self-care can not only enhance individual well-being but also contribute to reducing the costs associated with healthcare both in the state and nationally. The resolution encourages citizens, health professionals, and policymakers to promote the concept of self-care among the populace.

Contention

While the resolution itself is affirmatively aimed at promoting health and wellness, potential points of contention could arise in discussions of funding and resources necessary to support self-care education initiatives. Additionally, stakeholders may debate the efficacy of self-care in addressing systemic health disparities, especially among lower-income families who may not have full access to the resources needed to effectively practice self-care. There may also be discussions regarding the responsibilities of healthcare providers in encouraging self-care as part of treatment plans.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

MI HR0077

A resolution to declare April 16, 2023, as Healthcare Decisions Day in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0194

A resolution to declare February 2024 as School-Based Health Care Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0043

A resolution to declare February 28, 2023, as School-Based Health Care Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.

MI SR0022

A resolution to recognize March 30, 2025, as Doctors Day.

MI HR0252

A resolution to declare May 12, 2024, as Fibromyalgia Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0130

A resolution to declare August 6-12, 2023, as National Health Center Week in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0219

A resolution to declare April 11-17, 2024, as Black Maternal Health Week in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0125

A resolution to declare June 27, 2023, as Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.