Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HR0077

Introduced
4/19/23  

Caption

A resolution to declare April 16, 2023, as Healthcare Decisions Day in the state of Michigan.

Impact

The resolution highlights that approximately only 20% of Michiganders have completed an advance directive, indicating a significant knowledge gap and public confusion surrounding these legal documents. By proclaiming Healthcare Decisions Day, the state aims to encourage residents, healthcare facilities, and communities to engage in conversations about end-of-life care planning and facilitate access to clear and coherent information regarding advance directives.

Summary

House Resolution 0077 seeks to designate April 16, 2023, as Healthcare Decisions Day in Michigan. This initiative is part of a nationwide effort to enhance public understanding of the importance of advance care planning. The resolution emphasizes the need for individuals to communicate their healthcare decisions, particularly concerning end-of-life care, and advocates for the use of advance directives to ensure that patients' wishes are honored when they can no longer speak for themselves.

Contention

One of the notable goals of Healthcare Decisions Day is to rally hospitals, nursing homes, assisted living facilities, and other healthcare providers to participate in statewide efforts to promote education on advance directives. The resolution aims to increase the number of residents who execute these documents, which is crucial for reducing the burdens on families and healthcare professionals when making difficult decisions without guidance.

Community engagement

Furthermore, various healthcare, business, faith-based organizations, and senior service groups across Michigan have shown leadership in pushing for advance care planning. By declaring this specific day, the resolution seeks to draw attention to these organizations' efforts and reinforce the importance of planning for healthcare decisions among all citizens.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

MI HR0025

A resolution to declare February 2023 as Self-Care Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0194

A resolution to declare February 2024 as School-Based Health Care Awareness Month in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0043

A resolution to declare February 28, 2023, as School-Based Health Care Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.

MI SR0022

A resolution to recognize March 30, 2025, as Doctors Day.

MI HR0252

A resolution to declare May 12, 2024, as Fibromyalgia Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0219

A resolution to declare April 11-17, 2024, as Black Maternal Health Week in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0130

A resolution to declare August 6-12, 2023, as National Health Center Week in the state of Michigan.

MI HR0125

A resolution to declare June 27, 2023, as Post-Traumatic Stress Disorder Awareness Day in the state of Michigan.