House | 05/14/2025 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Received On 05/14/2025 | ||
House | 05/14/2025 | Referred To Committee On Appropriations | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Passed Roll Call # 99 Yeas 19 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Amendment(s) Withdrawn | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Amendment(s) Defeated | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Substitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In | ||
Senate | 05/13/2025 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 05/08/2025 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 05/06/2025 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) 5/6/2025 | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Introduced By Senator Sylvia Santana |