|
01/31/2023
|
Secretary of State Chapter 4
|
|
|
|
01/31/2023
|
Governor's action Approval
|
|
|
|
01/31/2023
|
Secretary of State, Filed
|
|
|
|
01/31/2023
|
Governor approval
|
|
|
|
01/31/2023
|
Presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Returned from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Third reading Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Special Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2023
|
Motion did not prevail to strike from General Orders and re-refer to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Second reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduction and first reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2023
|
Received from House
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Bill was passed
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Point of order raised, ruled well taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Point of order raised, ruled not well taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Amendments offered
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, January 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy
|
|
|