House | 03/13/2023 | Authors added Frazier and Hassan | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Author added Grossell | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Author added Brand | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Author added Agbaje | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Authors added Greenman and Hemmingsen-Jaeger | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Authors added Hudson and Bliss | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Author added Stephenson | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Author added Freiberg | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Author added Tabke | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Children and Families Finance and Policy |