Senate | 03/08/2023 | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF294 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Second reading | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF294, now on General Orders | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Introduction and first reading | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Received from House | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Author added Zeleznikar | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Bill was passed as amended | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Third reading as amended | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 2, 2023 | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Author added Urdahl | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Committee report, to adopt | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Author added Mueller | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Author added Myers | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Author added Becker-Finn | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |