Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Introduction and first reading | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Received from House | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Bill was passed | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Motion did not prevail | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Motion to re-refer Children and Families Finance and Policy | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Third reading | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | Amendments offered | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, February 13, 2023 | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Second reading | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Author added Hornstein | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Author changed Pinto shown as chief author | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Authors added Kraft; Howard | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Authors added Lee, K.; Lillie; and Curran | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Authors added Noor, Hortman, Feist | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Author changed Keeler as chief author | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Children and Families Finance and Policy |