04/27/2023 | Secretary of State Chapter 29 | |||
04/27/2023 | Governor's action Approval | |||
04/27/2023 | Secretary of State, Filed | |||
04/27/2023 | Governor approval | |||
04/26/2023 | Presented to Governor | |||
House | 04/24/2023 | Returned from Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Third reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Special Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF63 | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Second reading | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF63 | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Introduction and first reading | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Received from House | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Bill was passed | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Point of order raised, ruled well taken | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Amendments offered | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |