House | 03/16/2023 | Author added Gillman | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Author added Dotseth | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Motion did not prevail | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Motion to suspend rules | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Author added Zeleznikar | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Author added Bliss | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Author added Torkelson | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Authors added Robbins; Backer; Anderson, P. H.; Hudella; Bennett; Knudsen; Kresha; and Mekeland | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |