House | 04/20/2023 | Author added Perryman | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Author added Zeleznikar | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Authors added Knudsen; Bennett; Wiens | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Author added Anderson, P. E. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Author added Daniels | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Author added Joy | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |