House | 05/01/2023 | Authors added Pursell; Hicks; Kraft; Smith; Elkins; Lee, K.; Rehm | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Authors added Hussein; Hemmingsen-Jaeger | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Author added Frazier | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Author added Freiberg | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Author added Bahner | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Author added Moller | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Authors added Lillie, Fischer, Jordan, Xiong, and Youakim | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety Finance and Policy |