Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Comm report: To pass as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Introduction and first reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Received from House
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Bill was passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Point of order raised, ruled not well taken relating to a Call of the House
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Third reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, February 16, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt as amended
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed State and Local Government Finance and Policy
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Authors added Becker-Finn, Liebling, Youakim, Noor
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Introduction and first reading, referred to Labor and Industry Finance and Policy
|
|
|