House | 02/01/2023 | Second reading | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Author added Curran | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Author added Freiberg | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Author added Olson, L. | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government Finance and Policy | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Author added Jordan | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Authors added Xiong and Frazier | ||
House | 01/11/2023 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |