Minnesota 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF245 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 1.1 A bill for an act​
22 1.2 relating to natural resources; appropriating money for a report on rough fish.​
33 1.3BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
4-1.4 Section 1. NATIVE FISH CONSERVATION; APPROPRIATION.​
5-1.5 (a) $134,000 in fiscal year 2024 and $134,000 in fiscal year 2025 are appropriated from​
6-1.6the heritage enhancement account in the game and fish fund to the commissioner of natural​
7-1.7resources for native fish conservation and classification.​
8-1.8 (b) By August 1, 2023, a written update on the progress of identifying necessary​
9-1.9protection and conservation measures for native fish currently defined as rough fish under​
10-1.10Minnesota Statutes, section 97A.015, subdivision 43, including buffalo, sucker, sheepshead,​
11-1.11bowfin, gar, goldeye, and bullhead, must be submitted to the chairs and ranking minority​
12-1.12members of the house of representatives and senate committees and divisions with jurisdiction​
13-1.13over the environment and natural resources.​
14-1.14 (c) By December 15, 2023, a written report with recommendations for statutory and rule​
15-1.15changes to provide necessary protection and conservation measures and research needs for​
16-1.16native fish currently designated as rough fish must be submitted to the chairs and ranking​
17-1.17minority members of the house of representatives and senate committees and divisions with​
18-1.18jurisdiction over the environment and natural resources. The report must include​
19-1.19recommendations for amending Minnesota Statutes to classify fish that are native to​
20-1.20Minnesota that are currently designated as rough fish and invasive fish currently designated​
21-1.21as rough fish separately. For the purposes of this paragraph, native fish include but are not​
22-1.22limited to bowfin (Amia calva), bigmouth buffalo (Ictiobus cyprinellus), smallmouth buffalo​
4+1.4 Section 1. ROUGH FISH REPORT; APPROPRIATION.​
5+1.5 $....... in fiscal year 2024 is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of​
6+1.6natural resources to evaluate fish designated as rough fish in the state to determine if fish​
7+1.7species are properly designated and if there are rough fish species that are in need of​
8+1.8additional protection through regulations and to determine any research needs. The​
9+1.9commissioner must submit a report with the results of the evaluation and any​
10+1.10recommendations to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees​
11+1.11and divisions with jurisdiction over the environment and natural resources by June 30, 2025.​
12+1.12This is a onetime appropriation and is available until June 30, 2025.​
2313 1​Section 1.​
24-REVISOR CKM H0245-1HF245 FIRST ENGROSSMENT
14+REVISOR CKM/AD 23-0145912/29/22
2515 State of Minnesota​
2616 This Document can be made available​
2717 in alternative formats upon request​
2818 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
2919 H. F. No. 245​
3020 NINETY-THIRD SESSION​
31-Authored by Jordan; Becker-Finn; Norris; Hansen, R.; Lee, F., and others​01/11/2023​
21+Authored by Jordan; Becker-Finn; Norris; Hansen, R., and Lee, F.,​01/11/2023​
3222 The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy​
33-Adoption of Report: Amended and re-referred to the Committee on Ways and Means​01/30/2023​ 2.1(Ictiobus bubalus), burbot (Lota lota), longnose gar (Lepisosteus osseus), shortnose gar​
34-2.2(Lepisosteus platostomus), goldeye (Hiodon alosoides), mooneye (Hiodon tergisus), and​
35-2.3white sucker (Catostomus commersonii), and invasive fish include but are not limited to​
36-2.4bighead carp (Hypophthalmichthys nobilis), grass carp (Ctenopharyngodon idella), and​
37-2.5silver carp (Hypophthalmichthys molitrix).​
38-2​Section 1.​
39-REVISOR CKM H0245-1​HF245 FIRST ENGROSSMENT​